Accounts and annual returns THE KING SAUD FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1138415
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 28 April 2019 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 28 April 2019 Not submitted
Annual return 28 April 2018 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 28 April 2018 Not submitted
Annual return 28 April 2017 18 January 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 28 April 2017 Not Required
Annual return 28 April 2016 18 January 2018 324 days late
Accounts and TAR 28 April 2016 Not Required