BRIGHTON GAY MEN'S CHORUS
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Singing and social group, performing locally and providing support for gay men. The charity is no longer active and activities are now run by the CIO charity 1171020.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2018
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Brighton And Hove
Governance
- 11 August 2010: Standard registration
- 03 January 2020: Removed (Transfer of funds)
- BGMC (Working name)
- BRIGHTON GAY MEN'S CHORUS (Previous name)
- CITY OF BRIGHTON GAY MEN'S CHORUS (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2013 | 31/12/2014 | 31/12/2015 | 31/12/2016 | 31/05/2018 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £56.39k | £67.91k | £108.19k | £73.25k | £68.48k | |
|
Total expenditure | £54.17k | £61.06k | £108.58k | £67.52k | £49.16k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2018 | 13 November 2019 | 227 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2018 | 13 November 2019 | 227 days late | |
Annual return | 31 December 2016 | 31 October 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2016 | 31 October 2017 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2015 | 23 December 2016 | 53 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2015 | 23 December 2016 | 53 days late |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 16/09/2008 AS AMENDED ON 26/10/2010
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE PUBLIC EDUCATION BY THE STUDY, PRACTICE AND PUBLIC PERFORMANCE OF CHORAL MUSIC; AND TO ASSIST OTHER CHARITABLE CAUSES. (2) FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT TO ADVANCE AND PROMOTE THE EDUCATION OF GAY AND GAY-FRIENDLY MEN IN BRIGHTON AND HOVE IN THE SUBJECT OF CHORAL MUSIC, ITS STUDY, PRACTICE AND PERFORMANCE. (3) THE PROMOTION OF EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY THE ELIMINATION OF DISCRIMINATION ON THE GROUNDS OF SEXUAL ORIENTATION AND GENDER IDENTITY, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY RAISING PUBLIC AWARENESS OF DISCRIMINATION TOWARDS AND ISSUES AFFECTING THE LESBIAN, GAY, BI-SEXUAL AND TRANSGENDER (LGBT) COMMUNITY, AND IN SUCH OTHER WAYS AS ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window