HUNGERFORD, CHURCH ON THE ROCK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Hungerford Church on the Rock seeks to advance the Christian faith through a local church in Hungerford Berkshire. . We have supported various charities over this year to further the objects of the charity in supporting Christians and Christian organisations around the world.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- West Berkshire
- Wiltshire
Governance
- 15 September 2010: Standard registration
No other names
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
TIMOTHY HOSIER | Chair |
|
|
|||||
BRIAN REBBETTES | Trustee |
|
||||||
SIMON GRETTON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.87k | £10.93k | £11.94k | £11.50k | £16.44k | |
|
Total expenditure | £17.22k | £7.29k | £7.10k | £13.81k | £8.87k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 30 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 31 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 31 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 01 MAY 2010 AMENDED BY DEED OF VARIATION 14 SEPTEMBER 2010
Charitable objects
1 TO ADVANCE CHRISTIANITY IN BERKSHIRE AND ELSEWHERE, BY ANY MEANS OR MEDIUM THAT IS OR MAY BECOME AVAILABLE, IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF DOCTRINE SET OUT IN THE SCHEDULE 2 TO RELIEVE PEOPLE WHO ARE IN CHARITABLE NEED BECAUSE OF: 2.1 SICKNESS OR POOR HEALTH 2.2 AGE 2.3 FINANCIAL HARDSHIP 2.4 OR SOME OTHER REASON BY ANY PROPER MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT AND INCLUDING (WHERE APPROPRIATE BUT NOT BY WAY OF LIMITATION) THE PROVISION OF ADVICE; THE PROMOTION OF GOOD PRACTICES TO COMBAT SUCH CONDITIONS AND THE PROVISION OF RESOURCES TO ALLEVIATE OR PREVENT SUCH NEED 3 TO ADVANCE EDUCATION BOTH GENERAL AND VOCATIONAL FOR CHILDREN OR ADULTS BUT ALWAYS WITHIN THE PRINCIPLES OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH
Area of benefit
BERKSHIRE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
WHITEFIELDS FARM
OGBOURNE ST. GEORGE
MARLBOROUGH
SN8 1TA
- Phone:
- 01672841110
- Email:
- trbhosier@gmail.com
- Website:
-
churchontherockhungerford.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window