Financial history HUMAN CARE INITIATIVE

Charity Number: 1142454
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £40.68k £88.41k £219.04k £92.53k £92.60k
Total expenditure £40.34k £60.24k £237.11k £237.11k £50.88k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A