Financial history TRUST PROPERTY HELD IN CONNEXION WITH HILLEL HOUSE, CARDIFF

Charity Number: 500997
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £7.75k £2.60k £4.36k £7.52k £819
Total expenditure £3.09k £3.12k £4.33k £9.66k £4.23k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A