Oasis Community Hub: Bath

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Hub has a developing range of community activities to serve the community in and around Bath. These include a church, community development activities, food poverty programmes, intergenerational activities and making the building available for other groups to use.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Bath And North East Somerset
Governance
- 10 November 2010: Standard registration
- OASIS COMMUNITY HUB: IMMINGHAM (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Andy Ide | Trustee | 22 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Jo Rich | Trustee | 28 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lyndon Hughes | Trustee | 28 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
David Michael Vernalls | Trustee | 16 September 2019 |
|
|||||
Rev Robert John Trickey | Trustee | 16 September 2019 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £48.03k | £136.70k | £152.58k | £214.76k | £245.66k | |
|
Total expenditure | £36.42k | £97.91k | £148.45k | £170.22k | £224.28k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 22 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 22 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 12 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 12 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 14 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 14 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 25 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 25 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 22 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 22 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 27 APRIL 2010 as amended on 29 Apr 2019 as amended on 01 May 2024
Charitable objects
1 THE ADVANCEMENT FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT OF EDUCATION 2 THE ADVANCEMENT OF HEALTH AND THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF PUBLIC HEALTH GENERALLY 3 THE RELIEF OF PERSONS WHO ARE IN NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS AND THE PREVENTION AND RELIEF OF POVERTY
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Oasis Centre
1A Kennington Road
LONDON
SE1 7QP
- Phone:
- 020 7921 4200
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window