Accounts and annual returns DIASPORA VOLUNTEERING ALLIANCE

Charity Number: 1138736
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2019 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2019 Not submitted
Annual return 30 April 2018 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2018 Not submitted
Annual return 30 April 2017 01 February 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2017 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2016 13 April 2017 44 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2016 Not Required