KICKSTART GHANA

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
KickStart Ghana aims to ensure that the people of the Volta Region, in Ghana, can fulfil their potential and have every opportunity to succeed. We focus on the promotion of education and physical activity to achieve our vision and use a mixture of grants and volunteers to complete our aims.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2021
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Wandsworth
- Ghana
Governance
- 21 December 2010: Standard registration
- DAVE SQUARED VOLUNTEERING (Previous name)
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DAVID JOHN THORP BSC, MSC | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Jonathan Ahiekpor | Trustee | 23 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Kerry Price | Trustee | 01 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Katharine Lynn Horgan | Trustee | 01 March 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2017 | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £28.76k | £9.84k | £5.24k | £5.78k | £2.03k | |
|
Total expenditure | £28.43k | £11.43k | £5.00k | £3.75k | £4.14k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 209 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 209 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 575 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 575 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 19 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 27 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 05 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 04/05/2010 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 10/11/2011
Charitable objects
1 .THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY IN THE VOLTA REGION, GHANA BY PROVIDING: GRANTS, ITEMS AND SERVICES TO INDIVIDUALS IN NEED AND/OR CHARITIES, OR OTHER ORGANISATIONS WORKING TO PREVENT OR RELIEVE POVERTY 2. THE PROMOTION OF COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE VOLTA REGION, GHANA BY PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR PLAYING FOOTBALL 3. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS AT ST CECILIA SCHOOL, HO, THE VOLTA REGION, GHANA BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES NOT REQUIRED TO BE PROVIDED BY THE LOCAL EDUCATION AUTHORITY FOR EDUCATION AT THE SCHOOL
Area of benefit
GHANA
Contact information
- Address:
-
Flat 5
50 Berrylands Road
SURBITON
Surrey
KT5 8PD
- Phone:
- 07512246820
- Email:
- info@kickstartghana.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window