Trustees BETH SHALOM REFORM SYNAGOGUE
Charity number: 1136605

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David Spencer Karat | Chair | 03 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Nicholas Shenker | Trustee | 14 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Stacey | Trustee | 14 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Mark Ryten | Trustee | 14 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Glenn Richer | Trustee | 14 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Daniel Weiss | Trustee | 31 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Anna Sapir Abulafia | Trustee | 02 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Simon Gallant | Trustee | 02 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Michael Anthony Frankl | Trustee | 03 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Danielle Stacey Ross | Trustee | 27 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Peter Goldstein | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.