THE ROTARY CLUB OF PORTISHEAD TRUST FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Fund raising through organised events and public collections
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
16 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Bath And North East Somerset
- Bristol City
- North Somerset
- South Gloucestershire
Governance
- 23 June 2010: Standard registration
- THE ROTARY CLUB OF PORTISHEAD (Working name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Godfrey Michael Boothman Mr | Trustee | 08 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
David Daniel Michael Grant | Trustee | 17 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Timothy Mason | Trustee | 23 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD CHARLES BONFIELD | Trustee | 30 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Paul Howard Darling | Trustee | 20 August 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £15.07k | £3.44k | £43.53k | £29.54k | £20.88k | |
|
Total expenditure | £17.23k | £7.09k | £30.56k | £25.66k | £22.26k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 19 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 16 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 16 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 09 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 09 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 11 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 18 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 12 MAY 2010
Charitable objects
TO OR FOR THE RELIEF OF THE POOR AND NEEDY OR FOR SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSE, INSTITUTION, SOCIETY OR OBJECT AS THE ROTARY CLUB OF PORTISHEAD SHALL IN DULY CONSTITUTED MEETING FROM TIME TO TIME DIRECT
Area of benefit
PORTISHEAD
Contact information
- Address:
-
Flat 53
Estuary House
Lower Burlington Road
Portishead
BRISTOL
BS20 7BJ
- Phone:
- 01275845891
- Email:
- r.c.bonfield@btinternet.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window