Accounts and annual returns PLYMOUTH JUDO CLUB

Charity number: 1137574
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 27 July 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 27 July 2024 270 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 29 October 2023 363 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 17 March 2022 137 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 30 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required