PLYMOUTH JUDO CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
PJC are one of the oldest practising judo clubs in SW UK operating since 1955. It's a member of the National Governing Body for Olympic Judo, the British Judo Association. The club is fundraising to secure permanent premises and are providing Judo and martial art facilities and instruction to the people of Plymouth, Devon and the SW contributing to health and social activities of the public.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Devon
- Plymouth City
Governance
- 25 August 2010: Standard registration
- PJC (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ALAN KIMBER | Chair |
|
|
|||||
ALISON LAKE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SHANE KIMBER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JANET KIMBER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PAUL JOHN SLEEP | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.67k | £931 | £2.71k | £2.71k | £2.87k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.89k | £740 | £3.10k | £3.10k | £2.77k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 27 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 27 July 2024 | 270 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 29 October 2023 | 363 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 17 March 2022 | 137 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 30 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 17 FEBRUARY 2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 26 JULY 2010
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION OF COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF PLYMOUTH, DEVON BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR THE SPORT OF JUDO.
Area of benefit
PLYMOUTH
Contact information
- Address:
-
6 CANDISH DRIVE
PLYMOUTH
PL9 8DB
- Phone:
- 01752406576
- Email:
- info@plymouthjudoclub.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window