THE LEE WESTWOOD FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
DURING THE 2015 FINANCIAL YEAR THE FOUNDATION WAS DORMANT IN THAT IT DID NOT RECEIVE ANY INCOME FROM DONATIONS OR HAVE ANY EXPENSES IN THE FORM OF GRANTS OR DONATIONS TO OTHER CHARITIES. THE CHARITY RETAINED THE SURPLUS FUNDS FROM THE PREVIOUS YEAR IN THE CHARITY BANK ACCOUNT.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Cheshire East
Governance
- 22 July 2010: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
LEE WESTWOOD | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Helen Storey | Trustee | 08 December 2017 |
|
|
||||
JOHN WESTWOOD | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 09 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 04 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 17 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 17 March 2022 | 137 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 24 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED 01 JUNE 2010
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION OF COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION BY PROVIDING GOLFING OPPORTUNITIES FOR YOUNG CHILDREN IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND IRELAND IN PARTICULAR THOSE WHO ARE DISAVDANTAGED AND WOULD NOT OTHERWISE HAVE THE OPPORTUNITY OF BEING INTRODUCED TO THE GAME OF GOLF DUE TO FINANCIAL OR GEOGRAPHICAL CIRCUMSTANCES.
Area of benefit
THE UNITED KINGDOM AND IRELAND
Contact information
- Address:
-
Stonehage Fleming
6 St. James's Square
London
SW1Y 4JU
- Phone:
- 02070870000
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window