Accounts and annual returns RORY FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1137174
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2013 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2013 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2012 30 October 2013 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2012 30 October 2013 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2011 11 September 2012 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2011 Not Required