AMEN CHURCH OF CHRIST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
1) Amen Church of Christ provides our community with a place of worship for the purpose of advocating peace. 2) We provide recreation facilities within the community. 3) We advocate for equality, respect, unity and peace as a measure of combating the gang and crime culture within our community. 4) We promote inter-faith relationship and cultural integration.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Accommodation/housing
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout London
Governance
- 14 December 2010: Standard registration
- AMEN CHURCH OF GOD (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev EMMANUEL MENTA | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Aaliyah Barrie | Trustee | 01 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Peter Yinfaowei | Trustee | 01 May 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £215.02k | £144.09k | £171.07k | £249.23k | £327.49k | |
|
Total expenditure | £222.50k | £137.01k | £162.68k | £244.21k | £336.41k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 25 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | 25 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 08 April 2024 | 39 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | 08 April 2024 | 39 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 13 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | 13 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 29 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | 29 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 18 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | 18 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 30 APRIL 2010 AS AMENDED 9 JANUARY 2011
Charitable objects
(I) THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION BY THE PROCLAMATION AND FURTHERANCE OF THE GOSPEL OF GOD CONCERNING HIS SON JESUS CHRIST THE LORD AND THE PREACHING AND TEACHING OF THE WORD OF GOD BY THE CHURCH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF FUNDAMENTAL TRUTH OF ASSEMBLIES OF GOD IN GREAT BRITAIN AND IRELAND AS APPROVED BY GENERAL COUNCIL FROM TIME TO TIME (THE STATEMENT). (II) SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS SHALL FURTHER THE ATTAINMENT OF THE ABOVE OBJECTS OF THE CHURCH OR ANY OF THEM.
Area of benefit
LONDON
Contact information
- Address:
-
185 Dartmouth Road
LONDON
SE26 4RQ
- Phone:
- 07539276420
- Email:
- e.menta@hotmail.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window