TEESSIDE UNIVERSITY STUDENTS' UNION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TUSU offers student social and study spaces, SU Student Support (academic, welfare, jobs), SU Activities, The Terrace venue and catering, The Hub venue, and SU Shop. Student Officers and Representatives sit on University bodies and meet with the local Council and other organisations. It has student opportunities for nearly 3,000 students in sport, activities and academic roles in the University.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2022
Total income:
£3,049,706
Donations and legacies | £1.66m | |
Charitable activities | £840.82k | |
Other trading activities | £552.01k | |
Investments | £204 | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£2,980,086
Raising funds | £478.88k | |
Charitable activities | £2.50m | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £478.88k | |
Charitable expenditure | £2.50m | |
Retained for future use | £69.62k |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Darlington
- Durham
- Hartlepool
- Middlesbrough
- North Yorkshire
- Redcar And Cleveland
- Stockton-on-tees
Governance
- 14 July 2010: Standard registration
- 04 August 2023: Removed (Transfer of funds)
- 04 August 2023: Funds transferred to 1199285 TEESSIDE UNIVERSITY STUDENTS' UNION
- TUSU (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2018 | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 30/09/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.43m | £3.10m | £2.71m | £1.72m | £3.05m | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.60m | £3.24m | £2.76m | £1.91m | £2.98m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £128.77k | £248.18k | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £1.76m | £1.49m | £1.60m | £1.57m | £1.66m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £355.90k | £374.00k | £292.75k | £26.51k | £552.01k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £1.32m | £1.23m | £814.86k | £124.52k | £840.82k | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £164 | £1.52k | £2.97k | £633 | £204 | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £3.32m | £2.96m | £2.51m | £1.88m | £2.50m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £286.67k | £288.03k | £255.29k | £21.17k | £478.88k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £29.55k | £32.38k | £31.92k | £33.18k | £66.24k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/07/2018 | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 30/09/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £793.54k | £581.47k | £368.32k | £153.64k | £0 | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £1.13m | £1.19m | £949.98k | £924.73k | £1.21m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | -£1.65m | -£1.60m | -£2.41m | -£2.31m | -£2.08m | |
|
Total liabilities | £797.94k | £794.22k | £399.61k | £450.78k | £692.01k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 28 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 28 March 2023 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 30 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 30 November 2021 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 04 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 04 May 2021 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 28 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | 28 May 2020 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 07 MAY 2010 AS AMENDED ON 21 NOV 2017
Charitable objects
THE UNION'S OBJECTS ARE THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION OF STUDENTS AT TEESSIDE UNIVERSITY FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY: 1. PROMOTING THE INTERESTS AND WELFARE OF STUDENTS AT TEESSIDE UNIVERSITY DURING THEIR COURSE OF STUDY AND REPRESENTING, SUPPORTING AND ADVISING STUDENTS; 2. BEING THE RECOGNISED REPRESENTATIVE CHANNEL BETWEEN STUDENTS AND TEESSIDE UNIVERSITY AND ANY OTHER EXTERNAL BODIES; AND 3. PROVIDING SOCIAL, CULTURAL, SPORTING AND RECREATIONAL ACTIVITIES AND FORUMS FOR DISCUSSIONS AND DEBATE FOR THE PERSONAL DEVELOPMENT OF ITS STUDENTS.
Area of benefit
TEESSIDE UNIVERSITY
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window