THREE SPIRES FAMILY SUPPORT TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To practically support vulnerable families in Coventry, helping them to build relationships & networks though the provision of a Christian city centre parenting support project called Coffee Tots. We provide a safe space within a cafe setting for parents with young children with activities for children & training in life skills for parents as well as practical help & support and a listening ear.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
58 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Coventry City
Governance
- 06 September 2010: Standard registration
- 19 December 2024: Funds received from 1178106 WOOTTON WAWEN PRE-SCHOOL
- COFFEE TOTS (Working name)
- THREE SPIRES TOTS (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Margaret Ruth Parker | Trustee | 27 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
PAUL STEPHEN MORRIS | Trustee | 17 June 2024 |
|
|||||
James Kevin McCabe | Trustee | 24 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Naomi Grew | Trustee | 11 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Jane Ockenden | Trustee | 11 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Jayne Davies | Trustee | 11 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
JEAN HOWARD | Trustee | 11 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
JANE HALLIDAY | Trustee | 30 September 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £184.32k | £170.11k | £171.38k | £199.08k | £210.02k | |
|
Total expenditure | £180.34k | £155.06k | £147.86k | £193.24k | £226.42k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £57.81k | £78.48k | £6.88k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 29 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 29 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 26 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 26 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 10 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 10 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 12 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 12 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 19 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 03 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 03/01/2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 22/06/2010 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 16/08/2010 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 11/08/2015
Charitable objects
1) TO PROMOTE SOCIAL INCLUSION OF PARENTS WITH YOUNG CHILDREN FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY THE PROVISION OF A DROP IN CENTRE IN ORDER TO PREVENT THEM FROM BECOMING SOCIALLY EXCLUDED. RELIEVING THEIR NEEDS AND ASSISTING THEM TO INTEGRATE INTO SOCIETY. 2) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PARENTS WITH YOUNG CHILDREN IN THE PROVISION OF PARENTING SKILLS, RELATIONSHIPS, CHILDCARE AND MONEY MANAGEMENT..
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Three Spires Family Support Trust (Coffee Tots)
The Wave Waterpark
New Union Street
Coventry
CV1 2PS
- Phone:
- 07403226211
- Email:
- COFFEETOTS@GOOGLEMAIL.COM
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window