Financial history SIR ROBERT GEFFERY'S PRESCHOOL

Charity number: 1136886
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £164.66k £156.06k £208.73k £202.53k £240.20k
Total expenditure £159.26k £161.78k £202.92k £217.56k £208.64k
Income from government contracts £92.32k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A