BRITISH TRIATHLON FOUNDATION TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Using the engaging sport of triathlon we encourage children to become more active, improving their health, developing their social skills, increasing self esteem and nurturing good habits such as commitment, discipline and respect. Delivered through schools, large sporting events and family friendly festivals, these swim-bike-run based participation events are free for children, aged 7-13.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
- Scotland
Governance
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gary Adey | Chair | 24 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Anna Claire Cochrane | Trustee | 02 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Ruth Daniels | Trustee | 07 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Wynne Roberts | Trustee | 17 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Paige | Trustee | 17 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Giorgio Cali | Trustee | 01 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Patrick Craig | Trustee | 01 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Graham Rice | Trustee | 08 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Debbie Elizabeth Clarke Ch MCSI | Trustee | 08 October 2019 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £252.89k | £85.36k | £13.09k | £11.53k | £52.38k | |
|
Total expenditure | £275.62k | £93.10k | £11.81k | £5.10k | £16.50k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £26.05k | £18.44k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 03 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 03 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 22 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 07 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 05 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 05 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 16 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 16 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 17 MAY 2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 24 OCT 2017
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE FOUNDATION ARE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT: 1. TO PROMOTE OR ASSIST IN PROMOTING COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION BY PROVIDING FACILITIES FOR TRIATHLON AND OTHER SPORTS (FACILITIES MEANS ORGANISING SPORTING ACTIVITIES, EQUIPMENT, BUILDINGS AND LAND); 2. TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THOSE FOR WHOM THE FACILITIES ARE PROVIDED; 3. TO ADVANCE AND ASSIST IN ADVANCING EDUCATION; 4. TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT HEALTH; 5. TO PROMOTE SOCIAL INCLUSION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY PREVENTING PEOPLE FROM BECOMING SOCIALLY EXCLUDED, RELIEVING THE NEEDS OF THOSE PEOPLE WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED AND ASSISTING THEM TO INTEGRATE INTO SOCIETY. FOR THE PURPOSE OF THIS CLAUSE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED MEANS BEING EXCLUDED FROM SOCIETY, OR PARTS OF SOCIETY, AS A RESULT OF ONE OF MORE OF THE FOLLOWING FACTORS: UNEMPLOYMENT; FINANCIAL HARDSHIP; YOUTH OR OLD AGE; ILL HEALTH (PHYSICAL OR MENTAL); SUBSTANCE ABUSE OR DEPENDENCY INCLUDING ALCOHOL AND DRUGS; DISCRIMINATION ON THE GROUNDS OF SEX, RACE, DISABILITY, ETHNIC ORIGIN, RELIGION, BELIEF, CREED, SEXUAL ORIENTATION OR GENDER RE-ASSIGNMENT; POOR EDUCATIONAL OR SKILLS ATTAINMENT; RELATIONSHIP AND FAMILY BREAKDOWN; POOR HOUSING (THAT IS HOUSING THAT DOES NOT MEET BASIC HABITABLE STANDARDS; CRIME (EITHER AS A VICTIM OF CRIME OR AS AN OFFENDER REHABILITATING INTO SOCIETY); 6. TO PROMOTE ANY OTHER PURPOSE WHICH IS CHARITABLE . THROUGHOUT THESE ARTICLES A CHARITABLE PURPOSE IS A PURPOSE THAT IS REGARDED AS CHARITABLE IN THE LAWS OF EVERY PART OF THE UNITED KINGDOM AND THE TERM CHARITABLE IS TO BE INTERPRETED IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE LAWS OF EVERY PART OF THE UNITED KINGDOM.
Area of benefit
THE UNITED KINGDOM.
Contact information
- Address:
-
SportPark
The British Triathlon Federation
3 Oakwood Drive
Loughborough
Leicestershire
LE11 3QF
- Phone:
- 01509226161
- Email:
- contact@triathlontrust.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window