Financial history Horizons Education Trust

Charity number: 1136362
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £20.00k £0 £0 £0 £63
Total expenditure £256.88k £73.22k £1.68m £34.65k £14.00k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A