MASJID SALAHUDDIN

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We offer prayer facilities for men and women. Our Masjid is opened for daily prayers on the times for prayers five times a day and also for the Friday Speech and prayers. Helping the people who moved to the Leicester area is an important task for us. We are in the mosque in the process of helping the families whose first language not English, to give them support and help.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Leicester City
- Leicestershire
Governance
- 21 May 2010: Standard registration
- SALAHUDDIN COMMUNITY EDUCATION & RECREATION CENTRE (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ZAHIR OMAR HAMARASH | Chair |
|
|
|||||
NAJIM KARIM | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
KAMIL MUSTAFA | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £59.62k | £86.00k | £34.06k | £42.69k | £30.95k | |
|
Total expenditure | £71.84k | £85.90k | £20.02k | £16.54k | £18.19k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 19 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 19 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 19 December 2024 | 323 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 19 December 2024 | 323 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 03 February 2023 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 03 February 2023 | 3 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 17 March 2022 | 45 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 17 March 2022 | 45 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 17 March 2022 | 410 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 17 March 2022 | 410 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 14 MAY 2008
Charitable objects
1 TO ADVANCE THE RELIGION OF ISLAM, BY MEANS OF, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, PROMOTING THE TEACHINGS AND TENETS OF ISLAM, PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR WORSHIP AND PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR ISLAMIC EDUCATION, IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE TEACHINGS OF THE QUR'AN AND THE SUNNAH OF THE PROPHET MUHAMMAD (PBUH) AS DEFINED AND INTERPRETED BY THE AHLE SUNNAH WAL JAMAA-AH; 2 TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC BY MEANS OF, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, THE PROVISION OF KURDISH, ENGLISH AND ARABIC LANGUAGE CLASSES, COMMUNITY LEARNING PROGRAMMES AND ANY SUCH ACTIVITIES AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT; 3 TO RELIEVE FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AMONG VICTIMS OF NATURAL AND MAN-MADE DISASTERS, THE POOR AND NEEDY IN THE UK AND ABROAD BY MEANS OF, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, PROVIDING OR PAYING FOR ITEMS, SERVICES AND FACILITIES, INCLUDING THE PROVISION OF FOOD, CLEAN WATER AND ACCOMMODATION FOR THE SAID PERSONS; 4 TO PROMOTE ANY OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THOSE IN NEED THAT THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
THE UK AND ABROAD
Contact information
- Address:
-
9 UPPER GEORGE STREET
LEICESTER
LE1 3LQ
- Phone:
- 07803548513
- Email:
- zahir75@msn.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window