Trustees SELWOOD HOUSING SOCIETY LIMITED
Charity Number: 1141124

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Maureen Janet Robinson | Trustee | 02 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Samuel James Whatley | Trustee | 02 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
David William Hobdey | Trustee | 02 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Koo Chai Young Li Mow Ching | Trustee | 06 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Philip Whitehead | Trustee | 06 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Hannah Laura Jones | Trustee | 06 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Richard Yates | Trustee | 02 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Stella Jane Shepherd | Trustee | 01 August 2019 |
|
|
||||
Chris Butters | Trustee | 16 November 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.