Financial history FRIENDS OF COULSDON COFE SCHOOL

Charity number: 1136580
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £30.42k £8.78k £3.78k £18.28k £18.01k
Total expenditure £17.92k £22.38k £4.25k £23.14k £21.49k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A