THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF JARROW AND SIMONSIDE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Public worship open to all Provision of sacred space for personal prayer Pastoral work, including visiting the sick and the bereaved Teaching of Christianity through sermons, courses, small groups and religious assemblies in schools Provision of a youth group and activities for senior citizens, parents and toddlers and other special need groups Supporting charities in the UK and overseas
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £83,103 from 13 government grant(s)
People

22 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- South Tyneside
Governance
- 06 August 2010: Previously excepted registration
- PCC of Jarrow and Simmonside (Working name)
- THE PCC OF JARROW (Working name)
- THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF JARROW (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
22 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Lesley Marie Jones | Chair | 06 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rev Andrew McAllister | Trustee | 01 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Barbara Bradley | Trustee | 22 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Susan Short | Trustee | 22 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rev Jason Sydney Wratten | Trustee | 23 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jacqueline Brown | Trustee | 23 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
freda Elizabeth Carney | Trustee | 19 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Chrisrine Margaret Robertson | Trustee | 19 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
David George Jamieson | Trustee | 10 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Evelyn Margaret Rutherford | Trustee | 29 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Gordon Scott | Trustee | 29 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Kathleen Taylor | Trustee | 20 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Roy Charles Jackson | Trustee | 01 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Irene McConnachie | Trustee | 01 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Simon Robinson | Trustee | 27 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
WILLIAM JAMES GUY | Trustee | 26 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
Frederick Henry Hemmer | Trustee | 26 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
CAROL COWEN | Trustee | 27 April 2010 |
|
|
||||
RITA BLAKEY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Diane Jamieson | Trustee |
|
||||||
JACKI DUNN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CHRISTINE SMITH | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £230.61k | £446.78k | £111.08k | £203.64k | £181.01k | |
|
Total expenditure | £125.11k | £143.76k | £115.87k | £280.80k | £286.91k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £6.30k | £83.10k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 21 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 21 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 21 August 2024 | 295 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 21 August 2024 | 295 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 15 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 15 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 23 November 2021 | 23 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 23 November 2021 | 23 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 31 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 31 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
St Peter's Church
York Avenue
JARROW
NE32 5LP
- Phone:
- 0191 489 1925
- Email:
- jarrowandsimonside@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window