UPTON BAPTIST CHURCH, CHESTER

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Promotion of the Christian Gospel within the locality. Support of Christian work in other parts of the world. Provision of help and support in the community where the work is located, including childrens clubs and youth work, as well as adult work.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

9 Trustee(s)
75 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Cheshire West & Chester
Governance
- 23 September 2010: Previously excepted registration
- UBC (Working name)
- Upton Baptist Church (independent) (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Christopher Lawley | Trustee | 25 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Hardie Crerand | Trustee | 02 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Alex Taylor | Trustee | 25 February 2015 |
|
|
||||
PETER SIDDORN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JOHN HOCKING | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
IAN THOMPSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
IAN EDWARD WILLIAMS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MR RAY TIBBS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
David Faraday Stott | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £128.02k | £124.44k | £114.31k | £207.17k | £144.24k | |
|
Total expenditure | £141.12k | £99.58k | £105.23k | £105.06k | £113.59k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 29 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 29 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 22 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 22 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 05 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 05 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 16 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 16 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 29 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 29 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION 24 FEB 2010 as amended on 11 Sep 2022
Charitable objects
The principal object of the charity is the advancement of the Christian faith according to Baptist principles and in accordance with the Basis of Faith as stated in Schedule 1. The charity may also carry out other charitable purposes in the United Kingdom and/or other parts of the world.
Area of benefit
UNITED KINGDOM AND OTHER PARTS OF THE WORLD
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 Pitmans Lane
Hawarden
DEESIDE
Clwyd
CH5 3EE
- Phone:
- 01244341063
- Email:
- colindyke@hotmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window