Financial history TRADE AID UK FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1144621
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £48.00k £32.01k £14.31k £4.41k £834
Total expenditure £40.50k £30.55k £488 £7.90k £3.73k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A