MOSSEL BAY SIKH GURUDWARA TRUST UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
GENERAL CHARITABLE PURPOSES RELIGIOUS ACTIVITIES RELIEF OF POVERTY CULTURAL ACTIVTIES OF A PARTICULAR ETHNIC GROUP
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 06 April 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- South Africa
Governance
- 29 October 2010: Standard registration
- MOSSEL BAY SIKH GURUDWARA (Working name)
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
AJEET SINGH GILL MBE MBA | Chair |
|
|
|||||
KAMALJIT KAUR GILL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SARJEET KAUR GILL CQSW | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 06/04/2020 | 06/04/2021 | 06/04/2022 | 06/04/2023 | 06/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £98 | £985 | £235 | £451 | £934 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £2.13k | £500 | £1.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 06 April 2024 | 07 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 06 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 06 April 2023 | 07 August 2024 | 183 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 06 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 06 April 2022 | 05 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 06 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 06 April 2021 | 29 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 06 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 06 April 2020 | 18 March 2021 | 40 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 06 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 22 OCTOBER 2010
Charitable objects
(A) FURTHERANCE OF THE SIKH RELIGION AMONGST THE COMMUNITY OF SOUTH AFRICA BY PROVISION OF A TEMPLE TO BE KNOWN AS "SIKH GURUDWARA MOSSEL BAY". (B) TO RELIEVE POVERTY, TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES FOR RECREATIONAL AND OTHER ACTIVITIES WITH A VIEW TO IMPROVING CONDITIONS OF LIVING FOR THE SIKH AND WIDER COMMUNITY. (C) TO PROMOTE SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND OVERSEAS AS THE TRUSTEES IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE
Area of benefit
THE UNITED KINGDOM AND OVERSEAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
18 Bramley Orchard
Bushby
Leicester
LE7 9RU
- Phone:
- 01162434459
- Email:
- AJEET.GILL@CARE4FREE.NET
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window