SEVENTH DAY CHURCH OF GOD ( REFORMED )

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The main objective of the Church is to promote and advance the christian religion.. To achieve this objective, the church's main activities are church services; preach, equip, and release people into missionary work; engaging in activities to relieve poverty ; helping vulnerable members in the society, etc.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
100 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Elderly/old People
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Croydon
- Wandsworth
Governance
- 06 August 2010: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
EVANGELIST ROY ORMSBY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JOY PATRICIA CAMPBELL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SHARON KAYE ORMSBY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.59k | £18.38k | £22.30k | £23.36k | £31.83k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.50k | £988 | £3.96k | £11.44k | £10.21k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 30 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | 30 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 11 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 05 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 29 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 14 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 28 MAY 2010
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, THROUGHOUT LONDON.
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 JORDANS CLOSE
DAGENHAM
RM10 7DU
- Phone:
- 02085936428
- Email:
- cjoypatcam@aol.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window