ABOUSSOUAN ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We 're organising social activities such as a family outing in Margate (Kent) a giant BBQ in summer where the public meet and share their values, cultures, dances, exotic foods... Our fund raising is to buy foods for poor famillies and we organised christmas party for the children by giving them presents. We also organised dance training for alduts and cultural's event for the community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 13 February 2019
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Lambeth
- Southwark
Governance
- 11 May 2011: Standard registration
- ABOUSSOUAN (Working name)
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CASIMIR KOFFI | Chair |
|
|
|||||
MIEZAN AKA | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
BERNARD AHOUA | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
FABIEN KASSI | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MONIQUE ANOMA | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MICHEL NANGOH | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 13/02/2015 | 13/02/2016 | 13/02/2017 | 13/02/2018 | 13/02/2019 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.77k | £2.51k | £3.25k | £3.50k | £2.03k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.27k | £713 | £1.50k | £2.98k | £1.53k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 13 February 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 145 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 13 February 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 145 days | |
Annual return | 13 February 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 511 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 13 February 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 511 days | |
Annual return | 13 February 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 876 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 13 February 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 876 days | |
Annual return | 13 February 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1241 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 13 February 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1241 days | |
Annual return | 13 February 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1606 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 13 February 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1606 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 23/03/2010 AS AMENDED ON 12/03/2011
Charitable objects
"TO FURTHER OR BENEFIT THE PUBLIC, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY PEOPLE LIVING IN THE UNITED KINGDOM WHO ARE FROM THE IVORY COAST WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID PEOPLE AND THEIR LOCAL COMMUNITIES, THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION, RELIEVE POVERTY, RELIEVE SICKNESS, PRESERVE AND PROTECT GOOD HEALTH AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECTIVE OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID PEOPLE.
Area of benefit
THE UNITED KINGDOM
Contact information
- Address:
-
Flat 19
Grasmere Point
Old Kent Road
LONDON
SE15 1DT
- Phone:
- 07824157205
- Email:
- aboussouan@hotmail.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window