EUROPEAN BUDDHIST - HANMI ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The advancement of teaching, study, practice & observance of moral discipline as outlined in the Buddhist teachings of the Hanmi Esoteric School and that of Master Dechan Jueren and his lineage. The advancement of the Buddhist faith for the benefit of the public through raising monies for the instigation, upkeep & expansion of Buddhist centres, groups, monasteries & hospices for charitable works.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Essex
Governance
- 17 August 2010: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Alexander Demetrios Crawford | Chair |
|
|
|||||
SEAN CARROLL | Trustee | 18 October 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £19.27k | £17.22k | £12.73k | £3.52k | £1.04k | |
|
Total expenditure | £22.68k | £9.73k | £18.80k | £10.42k | £18.18k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 22 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 23 May 2024 | 84 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 14 March 2023 | 14 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | 23 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 23 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 28 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | 24 March 2021 | 24 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 06 APRIL 2010
Charitable objects
(A) THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE BUDDHIST FAITH FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THROUGH THE ACTIVITIES OF TEACHING, STUDY, PRACTICE AND THE OBSERVANCE OF MORAL DISCIPLINE FOCUSING ON THE BUDDHIST TEACHINGS OF THE HANMI ESOTERIC SCHOOL AND OF BUDDHIST MASTER DECHAN JUEREN AND HIS LINEAGE; AND (B) THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE BUDDHIST FAITH FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THROUGH RAISING MONIES FOR THE INSTIGATION, UPKEEP AND EXPANSION OF BUDDHIST CENTRES, GROUPS, MONASTERIES AND HOSPICES FOR CHARITABLE WORKS, DISASTER RELIEF AND THE RELIEF OF SUFFERING WORLDWIDE.
Area of benefit
WORLDWIDE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
12 Godfreys Mews
Macmillan Court
CHELMSFORD
CM2 0XE
- Phone:
- 07973210057
- Email:
- alex.crawford747@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window