BUNBURY WATERMILL TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Operation, maintenance, preservation and education of Bunbury Watermill.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
60 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Cheshire East
Governance
- 13 August 2010: Standard registration
- BUNBURY MILL (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
KEN BROSTER | Chair | 04 July 2013 |
|
|
||||
Clare Julia Groves | Trustee | 04 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Carolyn Jane Booker | Trustee | 04 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Grahame Shallcross | Trustee | 19 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Neil Fowkes | Trustee | 01 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL WYNNE THOMAS B A HONS | Trustee | 04 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
VALERIE ANN WALL | Trustee | 04 September 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.79k | £12.27k | £15.69k | £12.69k | £14.76k | |
|
Total expenditure | £16.54k | £4.38k | £7.14k | £13.34k | £16.39k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | £10.67k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 20 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 04 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 09 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 18 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 16 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED MADE 26 MAY 2010 as amended on 13 Feb 2020
Charitable objects
To advance the education and support of the public in all aspects of the social history of Bunbury, in particular the preservation, restoration and operation of Bunbury Watermill as a place of social historical interest and by establishing a museum and centre that acts as a focal point for the education and support of the local community and beyond.
Area of benefit
BUNBURY WATERMILL
Contact information
- Address:
-
4 The Orchards
Sadlers Wells
Bunbury
TARPORLEY
Cheshire
CW6 9SG
- Phone:
- 01829260381
- Email:
- Neil.Fowkes@bunburymill.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window