TRENT VALE GOSPEL HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Morning and Evening Services (Sundays) Bible Study and Teaching Ladies Meetings Aid parcel ministry Funeral services Bereavement support Support of food banks Literature distribution Overseas relief support Work amongst the Elderly Postal Bible School
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England
Governance
- 30 November 2010: Standard registration
- 16 August 2016: Funds received from 1073210 LIVING WORD POSTAL BIBLE SCHOOL
- SWAN LANE GOSPEL HALL (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DAVID ANSON JACKSON | Chair |
|
|
|||||
DAVID ARTHOR LIGHTFOOT | Trustee | 11 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
PETER NIXON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DAVID GEORGE BONE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £15.39k | £13.23k | £17.18k | £15.50k | £12.57k | |
|
Total expenditure | £23.42k | £10.24k | £12.05k | £16.85k | £12.36k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 05 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 06 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 10 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 25 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 27 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 6 NOVEMBER 2010 AS AMENDED ON 11 FEBRUARY 2011
Charitable objects
1) THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH ACCORDING TO THE PRINCIPLES OF THE TEACHING OF HOLY SCRIPTURE BY THE PROVISION OF WEEKLY SERVICES OR MEETINGS ARRANGED FOR WORSHIP AND TEACHING FROM SCRIPTURE 2) TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF TRENT VALE (STOKE-ON-TRENT) AND THE SURROUNDING AREA, SLGH PROVIDES A NUMBER OF ACTIVITIES TO SUPPORT THE LOCAL COMMUNITY, EG, BABY & TODDLERS' GROUP, SUNDAY SCHOOL, SUMMER CAMP, WEDDING AND FUNERAL SERVICES, BEREAVEMENT VISITATION, COMMUNITY COFFEE MORNINGS ETC. THESE ACTIVITIES MAY BE EXPANDED OR CLOSED DEPENDING ON THE SUPPORT OF THE LOCAL COMMUNITY. SLGH RECOGNISES YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES IN ALL THE SUPPORT ACTIVITIES AND MAKES NO CHARGE FOR THE MAJORITY OF OUR SUPPORT SERVICE, IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITION OF LIFE OF THE SAID INHABITANTS. SEE SECTION 11 ACTIVITIES 3) FOR PURPOSES DEEMED CHARITABLE BY THE SLGH CHARITY TRUSTEES AND THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES , AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TIME DECIDE BY PROVIDING GRANTS OF MONEY TO CHARITIES OR CHARITABLE ORGANISATION
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
6 Rykeneld Court
Knutton Road
NEWCASTLE
ST5 0LN
- Phone:
- 01782717035
- Website:
-
trentvalegospelhall.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window