THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF THE RESURRECTION, ALTON

Charity number: 1136970
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The primary object of the PCC is the promotion of the gospel of our Lord Jesus Christ according to the doctrine and practices of the Church of England. The PCC achieves this by focusing on four key aims: To understand and follow God's ways, to tell others about God, to meet the needs of others and challenge unjust structures in society and to care for God's Earth

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £273,334
Total expenditure: £309,153

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Hampshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 20 July 2010: Previously excepted registration
Organisation type:
Previously excepted
Other names:
  • PARISH OF THE RESURRECTION, ALTON'S PCC (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

16 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev ANDREW MARK MICKLEFIELD Chair 22 May 2014
PORTSMOUTH AND WINCHESTER DIOCESAN BOARD OF EDUCATION
Recently registered
Craig Peter Stolton Trustee 08 March 2023
None on record
Clive Muller Trustee 23 May 2022
None on record
Helen Walters Trustee 23 May 2022
ACTION ON SMOKING AND HEALTH (ASH)
Received: On time
ST MUNGO COMMUNITY HOUSING ASSOCIATION
Received: On time
Matthew David Bayliss Trustee 22 October 2020
None on record
Rev Gordon Charles Randall Trustee 23 June 2019
None on record
John Richard Vivian Trustee 28 April 2019
None on record
Debbie Parker Trustee 28 April 2019
None on record
ROBIN LINCOLN KEMP Trustee 28 April 2019
SOTERIA TRUST
Received: On time
The King's Arms Youth Project
Received: On time
Angela Mary Briggs Trustee 28 April 2019
None on record
VICTORIA ESTELLE HEWITT Trustee 29 April 2018
None on record
LISA LORRAINE HILLAN Trustee 13 June 2017
ABF CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
ALTON AND DISTRICT COMMUNITY RELIEF FOUNDATION
Received: On time
ROTARY CLUB OF ALTON TRUST FUND
Received: On time
ALTON UNITED CHARITIES
Received: 89 days late
Alan Roy Armstrong Trustee 30 April 2017
None on record
Wendy Jean Burnhams Trustee 26 May 2016
None on record
DEREK ALLAN GURNEY Trustee 26 April 2015
RESURRECTION TRADING
Received: On time
NEW FOREST KEEPERS WIDOWS FUND
Received: On time
SARAH MARGARET NEISH Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £300.71k £265.94k £236.58k £297.48k £273.33k
Total expenditure £328.91k £227.48k £245.82k £293.11k £309.15k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £11.94k £610 N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 29 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 29 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 01 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 01 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 24 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 24 June 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 06 July 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 06 July 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 27 June 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 27 June 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
The Vicarage
Church Street
ALTON
GU34 2BW
Phone:
01420513881