RCCG KINGDOM OF PRAISE AND THANKSGIVING HACKNEY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Christian Church Services and Seminars. Propagating Biblical Gospel through Evangelism. Feeding the homeless in our community
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 31 May 2011: Standard registration
- KOPAT (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PASTOR AKINTAYO AIYEGBUSI | Chair | 01 June 2014 |
|
|
||||
BAMIDELE JACKSON KOLAWOLE | Trustee | 01 June 2014 |
|
|
||||
DEACON MICHAEL OLUFEMI BOLORUNDURO | Trustee | 01 June 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £117.26k | £200.96k | £92.83k | £154.75k | £155.58k | |
|
Total expenditure | £140.71k | £95.37k | £140.47k | £164.28k | £154.95k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 26 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | 26 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 09 April 2024 | 9 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | 09 April 2024 | 9 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 13 July 2023 | 104 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | 13 July 2023 | 104 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 10 May 2022 | 40 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | 10 May 2022 | 40 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 05 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | 05 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 10/07/2010 AS AMENDED ON 31/10/2010
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF CHRISTIAN RELIGION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE ROUND CHAPEL
2 POWERSCROFT ROAD
LONDON
E5 0PU
- Phone:
- 07878075587
- Email:
- rccgkopat@aol.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window