APOSTOLIC FAITH MISSION - STEVENAGE

Charity Number: 1137332
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The advancement of Christian Religion according to the Holy Scriptures as contained in our Confession of Faith

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £160,021
Total expenditure: £113,833

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Religious Activities
  • Other Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England

Governance

Registration history:
  • 09 August 2010: Standard registration
  • 09 September 2012: Removed (Does not operate)
  • 20 January 2013: Re-registered
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:
  • SALVATION FELLOWSHIP (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Marvellous Elias Mavunga Trustee 08 December 2019
None on record
SHARON TAFURA Trustee 08 December 2019
None on record
COLLINS CHITSA Trustee 08 December 2019
None on record
EVERSON GWASHAWANHU BSc Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £126.12k £88.90k £76.29k £125.44k £160.02k
Total expenditure £112.95k £72.83k £81.42k £110.53k £113.83k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 14 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 14 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 17 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 17 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 23 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 23 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 27 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 27 January 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 15 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 15 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Poplars Community Centre
Magpie Crescent
Stevenage
SG2 9RZ
Phone:
01438315080