Financial history FRIENDS OF ANGELS ORPHANAGE

Charity number: 1139321
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2020 31/05/2021 31/05/2022 31/05/2023 31/05/2024
Total gross income £30.63k £28.65k £34.68k £25.33k £29.63k
Total expenditure £31.23k £28.36k £29.89k £30.51k £41.79k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A