TAMWORTH NURSERY (SPECIAL NEEDS)

Charity Number: 501043
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The Tamworth Nursery (Special Needs) sets out to support Early Years education for children with additional needs at Two Rivers School.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024

Total income: £65
Total expenditure: £16,388

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Disability
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • People With Disabilities
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Staffordshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 07 November 1972: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:
  • TAMWORTH NURSERY FOR HANDICAPPED CHILDREN (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Investment
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
CATHERINE EMILY TYLER Chair
None on record
ALYSON KETTEL Trustee
None on record
LORRAINE WOODALL Trustee
None on record
JANE MALLINSON Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £2.74k £1.88k £977 £102 £65
Total expenditure £162 £135 £1.87k £3.73k £16.39k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2024 17 February 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2023 28 June 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 28 March 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 18 August 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 19 March 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
7 OSPREY CLOSE
WHITTINGTON
LICHFIELD
WS14 9HT
Phone:
01543432428
Website:

No information available