Financial history COCKER AND ENGLISH SPRINGER SPANIEL RESCUE (CAESSR)

Charity number: 1137589
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £41.94k £39.74k £35.60k £41.38k £40.99k
Total expenditure £46.19k £36.93k £34.38k £50.47k £54.39k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A