Financial history SUTTON IN THE ELMS BAPTIST CHURCH

Charity number: 1136715
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £99.99k £68.58k £269.03k £158.30k £167.78k
Total expenditure £74.55k £70.51k £296.84k £115.39k £120.99k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £8.00k £8.12k N/A