Trustees SUTTON IN THE ELMS BAPTIST CHURCH
Charity number: 1136715

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jonathan Peter Morley | Chair | 01 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
Deborah Elizabeth Sawyer | Trustee | 19 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Anthony Richard Hill | Trustee | 28 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Peter David Clissold | Trustee | 22 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
David Anthony Wheway | Trustee | 24 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Robert William FOSTER | Trustee | 29 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
Heather Susan Harris | Trustee | 15 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW DAVIES | Trustee | 17 February 2014 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.