Accounts and annual returns GOLDEN GATES HOUSING TRUST

Charity Number: 1137675
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2017 05 December 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 03 October 2017 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2016 29 January 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 30 September 2016 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2015 17 November 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2015 18 September 2015 On Time