Trustees THE CHIPPENDALE SOCIETY
Charity number: 501046

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Adam Bowett | Chair | 12 May 2014 |
|
|
||||
David Allott | Trustee | 15 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Burton | Trustee | 01 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Adam Toole | Trustee | 08 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Pullan | Trustee | 12 May 2012 |
|
|
||||
LORD ST OSWALD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SIMON R BSTELL | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.