SAWSTON YOUTH GROUP LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance in life and help young people through the provision of both recreational and leisure time activities provided in the interest of social welfare, designed to improve their conditions of life, and by providing support and activities which help develop their skills, capacities and capabilities to enable them to participate in society as mature and responsible individuals.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Cambridgeshire
- Essex
Governance
- 13 July 2010: Standard registration
- SYG (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ALISTAIR JAMES MONTGOMERY | Chair | 18 September 2018 |
|
|||||
Holly Jade Burgess | Trustee | 01 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Stephen David Burgess | Trustee | 01 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Craig Barnes | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
caroline Burgess | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
PAUL WHITMELL FCA BSC | Trustee | 07 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
Michelle Ballantyne | Trustee | 01 September 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £31.29k | £25.42k | £44.28k | £48.71k | £27.83k | |
|
Total expenditure | £37.08k | £20.00k | £49.12k | £26.04k | £51.49k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £17.08k | £5.28k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 10 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 10 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 24 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 24 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 20 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 20 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 02 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 02 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 10 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 10 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 18 JANUARY 2008
Charitable objects
(A) (I) TO ADVANCE IN LIFE AND HELP YOUNG PEOPLE THROUGH: 1. THE PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL AND LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES PROVIDED IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE, DESIGNED TO IMPROVE THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE; 2. PROVIDING SUPPORT AND ACTIVITIES WHICH HELP DEVELOP THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS. (A) (II) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE IN MARCHING BAND MUSIC BY ESTABLISHING AND MAINTAINING A MARCHING BAND.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
82B HIGH STREET
SAWSTON
CAMBRIDGE
CB22 3HJ
- Phone:
- 01223830020
- Email:
- Contact@syg.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window