STRINGS OF LIFE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We have different fellowship groups. For children, young people, university students and local residents. We had worship training every year. To develop and improve our members creative arts gifts in order to perform, rearrange and compose hymns in contemporary worship style. We have worked with Leeds Chinese Community Association. We held some medical talks to Chinese people in Leeds.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2022
People

3 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Leeds City
Governance
- 19 January 2011: Standard registration
No other names
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lai Kwan CHAN | Trustee | 19 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Pui Lam Fung | Trustee | 01 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Chee Kong Cho | Trustee | 01 August 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 18/01/2019 | 18/01/2020 | 18/01/2021 | 18/01/2022 | 31/12/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £18.90k | £22.46k | £32.87k | £64.58k | £137.69k | |
|
Total expenditure | £17.61k | £21.94k | £14.77k | £40.38k | £145.18k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 183 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 183 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 15 May 2024 | 197 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 15 May 2024 | 197 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 18 January 2022 | 18 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 18 January 2022 | 18 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 18 January 2021 | 30 March 2022 | 132 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 18 January 2021 | 30 March 2022 | 132 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 18 January 2020 | 20 March 2021 | 122 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 18 January 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 25 APRIL 2010 AS AMENDED 28 DECEMBER 2011
Charitable objects
A) TO PROMOTE THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION AMONG MEMBERS OF THE CHINESE COMMUNITY IN LEEDS AND DISTRICT ACCORDING TO THE STATEMENT OF FAITH IN THE SCHEDULE HEREOF B) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THE CHINESE COMMUNITY IN LEEDS.(II) TO ESTABLISH OR PROCURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF COMMUNITY CENTRE AND MAINTAIN AND MANAGE SUCH A CENTRE.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Office 2, 1/F
30-36 Cross Stamford Street
LEEDS
LS7 1BA
- Phone:
- 07546527859
- Email:
- stringsoflifelcgc@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window