THE REACH FOR HEALTH CENTRE LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Physical and Mental Health Rehabilitation centre specialising in Exercise based Physiotherapy for long term and life long illnesses including, Stroke, Heart Disease, Back Pain, COPD, Asthma, Diabetes, MS, Mental Health Disorders, Joint Replacement, Cancer, Falls Prevention, Acquired Brain Injury, Poor Mobility, etc. Signatories to the Armed Forces Covenant to assist the Military community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Northamptonshire
Governance
- 07 October 2010: Standard registration
- THE REACH FOR HEALTH CENTRE LTD (Working name)
- DAVENTRY HEALTH REHABILITATION TRUST (Previous name)
- Daventry Health Rehabilitation Trust t/a The Reach for Health Centre (Previous name)
- REACH FOR HEALTH (Previous name)
- THE REACH FOR HEALTH CENTRE (Previous name)
- THE REACH FOR HEALTH CENTRE (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Christopher Heaton-Harris | Chair | 17 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Peter John Rollason | Trustee | 08 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Jarrod Baughan | Trustee | 31 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Roshni Khatri | Trustee | 29 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Salisbury | Trustee | 27 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
ROBERT JUSON | Trustee | 23 October 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £197.83k | £309.18k | £231.97k | £278.44k | £354.55k | |
|
Total expenditure | £187.36k | £191.18k | £267.07k | £311.80k | £355.43k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £10.00k | £56.13k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 20 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 20 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 09 August 2024 | 191 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 09 August 2024 | 191 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 25 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 25 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 1 JUNE 2010 as amended on 01 Dec 2020 as amended on 09 Mar 2022 as amended on 09 May 2022
Charitable objects
OBJECTS THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ARE SPECIFICALLY RESTRICTED TO THE FOLLOWING: THE OBJECTIVE OF THIS CHARITY IS TO RELIEVE SICKNESS AND PROTECT THE HEALTH OF PERSONS SUFFERING OR AT RISK FROM DISEASE, COMPLAINTS, PHYSICAL/MENTAL LIMITATIONS OR HEREDITARY CONDITIONS THAT LEAD TO POOR HEALTH.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE REACH FOR HEALTH CENTRE LTD
STEFEN HILL GROUND
WESTERN AVENUE
DAVENTRY
NORTHAMPTONSHIRE
NN11 4UD
- Phone:
- 01327871118
- Email:
- wadge@reachforhealth.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window