Trustees The Parochial Church Council of the Ecclesiastical Parish of Portsdown and Purbrook
Charity Number: 1137597

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Andrew Wilson | Chair | 01 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Pauline Campbell | Trustee | 17 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
William George Jeffery | Trustee | 18 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Christine Annice Graham Stone | Trustee | 18 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Valerie Kay Jeffery | Trustee | 18 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Marion Joyce Graham Pegg | Trustee | 18 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Katharine Ann Mew | Trustee | 18 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Linda Mary Banks | Trustee | 26 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Joanne Duckett | Trustee | 26 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Doe | Trustee | 26 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Graham Charles Olway | Trustee | 14 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Victoria May Stephen | Trustee | 14 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sheila Jane Gill | Trustee | 16 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Tracey Eleanor Harvey | Trustee | 16 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
MR A MINCHIN BSC | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.