Governing document THE HARROGATE CIVIC SOCIETY
Charity number: 501055
Up to date
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 13 FEBRUARY 1971 AS AMENDED 10 JUNE 1991, 29 JULY 1998 AND 15 APRIL 1999 as amended on 05 Feb 2015 as amended on 06 Jul 2015 as amended on 13 Mar 2023
Charitable objects
TO PROTECT, PRESERVE AND ENHANCE THE CHARACTER, AMENITIES AND ENVIRONMENT OF HARROGATE AND ITS ENVIRONS BY ANY SUCH MEANS AS ARE DEEMED CHARITABLE
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
HARROGATE
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.