GASWORKS DOCK PARTNERSHIP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
GDP was set up as a community led regeneration vehicle for Cody Dock and provides: Facilities for schools, universities, charities, community groups for education/training about the LLVs ecology, heritage and waterways. Providing amenities that promote greater use of the Lea. Promotes arts and crafts ,Community gardens, Docklands Community Boat ,Moorings and studio spaces
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024
Total income:
£652,253
Donations and legacies | £518.19k | |
Charitable activities | £134.07k | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £0 | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£638,426
Raising funds | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £638.43k | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £62,500 from 1 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £0 | |
Charitable expenditure | £638.43k | |
Retained for future use | £13.83k |
People

9 Employee(s)
6 Trustee(s)
4576 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Hackney
- Newham
- Tower Hamlets
Governance
- 19 April 2011: Standard registration
- GDP (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Marcus MacKenzie | Chair | 10 December 2016 |
|
|
||||
Oyetade Oyebode | Trustee | 14 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Timothy Vaughan | Trustee | 12 April 2018 |
|
|||||
Martin Torres | Trustee | 29 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
Bianca Mawani | Trustee | 01 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
Oladapo Oyodele Akanni Asuni | Trustee | 07 September 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2020 | 31/01/2021 | 31/01/2022 | 31/01/2023 | 31/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £464.85k | £906.24k | £618.65k | £1.07m | £652.25k | |
|
Total expenditure | £308.69k | £346.12k | £323.02k | £398.43k | £638.43k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £2.55k | N/A | N/A | N/A | £62.50k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | £859.87k | £525.65k | £954.77k | £518.19k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | £46.37k | £93.00k | £119.06k | £134.07k | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | £346.12k | £317.82k | £388.83k | £638.43k | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | £0 | £5.20k | £9.60k | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | £0 | £4.70k | £4.50k | £4.50k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/01/2020 | 31/01/2021 | 31/01/2022 | 31/01/2023 | 31/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | N/A | £381.73k | £1.03m | £1.85m | £1.87m | |
|
Long-term investments | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | N/A | £557.55k | £193.39k | £41.19k | £40.82k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | N/A | £97.59k | £83.99k | £82.71k | £84.95k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | 10 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | 10 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 14 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | 14 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | 25 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | 25 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | 19 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2020 | 19 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 25/01/2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 13/04/2011 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 13/04/2011 as amended on 30 Apr 2020
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT OF THE REGENERATION OF THE LONDON BOROUGH OF NEWHAM, THE LOWER LEA VALLEY AND THE THAMES GATEWAY BY ALL OR ANY OF THE FOLLOWING MEANS: 1 THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, TRAINING OR RETRAINING, PARTICULARLY AMONG UNEMPLOYED PEOPLE, AND PROVIDING UNEMPLOYED PEOPLE WITH WORK EXPERIENCE 2 THE CREATION OF TRAINING AND EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITIES BY THE PROVISION OF WORKSPACE, BUILDINGS AND/OR LAND FOR USE ON FAVOURABLE TERMS 3 THE MAINTENANCE, IMPROVEMENT OR PROVISION OF PUBLIC AMENITIES 4 THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC ABOUT THE HISTORY OF THE AREA BY THE CREATION OF AN INDUSTRIAL HERITAGE ARCHIVE AND MUSEUM 5 THE PROVISION OR ASSISTANCE IN THE PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL FACILITIES FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE AND/OR THOSE WHO, BY REASONS OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, POVERTY OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES, HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES 6 THE PROMOTION OF THE ARTS AND OF CRAFTS AND CRAFTSMANSHIP AND THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION 7 SUCH OTHER MEANS AS MAY FROM TIME TO TIME BE DETERMINED AND WHICH ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE 8. THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC ABOUT ECOLOGY, CONSERVATION, ENVIRONMENTAL STUDIES AND SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT, PARTICULARLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY IN RESPECT OF THE NATION?S WATERWAYS AND THE ECOLOGY OF THE LOCAL AREA SURROUNDING CODY DOCK AND TO PROMOTE THE STUDY AND RESEARCH IN SUCH SUBJECTS PROVIDED THAT USEFUL RESULTS THEREOF ARE PUBLISHED. 9. THE PROMOTION OF THE CONSERVATION, PROTECTION AND ENHANCEMENT OF THE PHYSICAL AND NATURAL ENVIRONMENT, PARTICULARLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY IN WAYS THAT FURTHER SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT.
Area of benefit
LONDON BOROUGH OF NEWHAM, THE LOWER LEA VALLEY AND THE THAMES GATEWAY
Contact information
- Address:
-
CODY DOCK
11C SOUTH CRESCENT
CODY ROAD
CANNING TOWN
LONDON
E16 4TL
- Phone:
- 02074730429
- Email:
- contact@codydock.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window