Financial history SANDWELL HOSPITAL LEAGUE OF FRIENDS

Charity number: 501058
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £119.13k £8.63k £29.25k £72.38k £83.33k
Total expenditure £80.88k £54.44k £26.54k £60.94k £91.28k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A