Trustees SANDWELL HOSPITAL LEAGUE OF FRIENDS
Charity number: 501058

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Cheryl Christine Whittingham | Chair | 29 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
June Beighton | Trustee | 20 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Trevor John Fossey | Trustee | 05 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
Gwen Bates | Trustee | 14 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
JOHN STOCKALL | Trustee | 01 November 2017 |
|
|||||
Pravina Gohel | Trustee | 29 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
JANET CUTTING | Trustee | 07 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
BARBARA LISSIMORE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SHIRLEY JAUNDRILL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JOAN DEVANEY | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.